AR SB75 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Provisions Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendments 91 And 101, To Provide That Proceeds May Be Applied To Multilane Highway Improvements; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Provisions Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendments 91 And 101, To Provide That Proceeds May Be Applied To Multilane Highway Improvements; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration. Motion passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |