AR SB75 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Notification that SB75 is now Act 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Notification that SB75 is now Act 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Replace The Arkansas Statues At The National Statuary Hall; To Place A Statue Honoring Daisy Lee Gatson Bates In The National Statuary Hall; To Place A Statue Honoring John R. "johnny" Cash In The National Statuary Hall.
Title
To Replace The Arkansas Statues At The National Statuary Hall; To Place A Statue Honoring Daisy Lee Gatson Bates In The National Statuary Hall; To Place A Statue Honoring John R. "johnny" Cash In The National Statuary Hall.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Notification that SB75 is now Act 581 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | The vote by which SB75 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Filed |