AR SB700 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Approval Of Emergency Rules.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Approval Of Emergency Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB700 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SB700.pdf |