AR SB672 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Fair Market Pay For Ambulatory Surgery Centers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Require Fair Market Pay For Ambulatory Surgery Centers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Filed |