AR SB658 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's License To Certain Applicants.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's License To Certain Applicants.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. Megan Godfrey [D] | Rep. Jay Richardson [D] | Sen. Joyce Elliott [D] |
Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed |