AR SB606 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB606 is now Act 908
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB606 is now Act 908
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's Instruction Permit By The Division Of Arkansas State Police.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's Instruction Permit By The Division Of Arkansas State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Notification that SB606 is now Act 908 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed |