AR SB594 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB594 is now Act 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB594 is now Act 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Residential Landlord-tenant Act Of 2007; And To Amend The Law Concerning A Cause Of Action For Unlawful Detainer And Forcible Entry And Detainer.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Residential Landlord-tenant Act Of 2007; And To Amend The Law Concerning A Cause Of Action For Unlawful Detainer And Forcible Entry And Detainer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB594 is now Act 1052 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1,2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1,2 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1 and 2. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-22 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-04-20 | House | Motion to rerefer back to committee passed |
2021-04-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-04-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed |