AR SB589 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Modification Of A Child Custody Or Visitation Order.
Title
Concerning The Modification Of A Child Custody Or Visitation Order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed |