AR SB579 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB579 is now Act 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB579 is now Act 783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Process By Which The State Highway Commission May Sell Or Dispose Of Surplus Property.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Process By Which The State Highway Commission May Sell Or Dispose Of Surplus Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Notification that SB579 is now Act 783 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |