AR SB572 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Medical Corporation Act; And To Allow A Nonlicensed Person To Be An Officer, Director, Or Shareholder Of A Medical Corporation.
Title
To Amend The Medical Corporation Act; And To Allow A Nonlicensed Person To Be An Officer, Director, Or Shareholder Of A Medical Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The vote by which SB572 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB572 failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |