AR SB539 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding The Payment Of Wages; And To Establish Parameters Regarding The Recoupment Of Overpayments By Employers.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding The Payment Of Wages; And To Establish Parameters Regarding The Recoupment Of Overpayments By Employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |