AR SB531 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-27-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Notification that SB531 is now Act 577
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Legislative Arts And Technology Boot Camp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Legislative Arts And Technology Boot Camp.

Sponsors

Sen. Joyce Elliott [D]Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Fred Allen [D]Rep. Keith Brooks [R]
Rep. Craig Christiansen [R]Rep. Joe Cloud [R]Rep. Nicole Clowney [D]Rep. Andrew Collins [D]
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Denise Ennett [D]
Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D]Rep. Ken Ferguson [D]
Rep. David Fielding [D]Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Vivian Flowers [D]Rep. Denise Garner [D]
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Megan Godfrey [D]Rep. Delia Haak [R]Rep. Spencer Hawks [R]
Rep. Monte Hodges [D]Rep. Mike Holcomb [R]Rep. Ashley Hudson [D]Rep. Lee Johnson [R]
Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Frederick Love [D]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]
Rep. Stephen Magie [D]Rep. Rick McClure [R]Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]Rep. Tippi McCullough [D]
Rep. Richard McGrew [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]Rep. Reginald Murdock [D]Rep. Milton Nicks [D]
Rep. Clint Penzo [R]Rep. Jay Richardson [D]Rep. Jamie Scott [D]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]
Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Joy Springer [D]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]
Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. David Whitaker [D]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Sen. Bob Ballinger [R]
Sen. Charles Beckham [R]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D]
Sen. Breanne Davis [R]Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R]Sen. Lance Eads [R]Sen. Jane English [R]
Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Jim Hendren [I]Sen. Bart Hester [R]Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]
Sen. Ricky Hill [R]Sen. Keith Ingram [D]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]
Sen. Mark Johnson [R]Sen. Greg Leding [D]Sen. Matthew Pitsch [R]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]
Sen. Bill Sample [R]Sen. James Sturch [R]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. Larry Teague [D]
Sen. Clarke Tucker [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateNotification that SB531 is now Act 577
2021-04-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-01HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-03-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-22SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2021-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback