AR SB488 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Conduct A Study On Gambling Disorder Prevention, Treatment, Counseling, And Education; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Conduct A Study On Gambling Disorder Prevention, Treatment, Counseling, And Education; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 22 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-04-03 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |