AR SB484 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB484 is now Act 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB484 is now Act 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify The Law Concerning Charitable Organizations; To Clarify Contributions Of Charitable Organizations; And To Exclude Certain Bequests And Testamentary Distributions From Trusts From Contributions.
Title
To Modify The Law Concerning Charitable Organizations; To Clarify Contributions Of Charitable Organizations; And To Exclude Certain Bequests And Testamentary Distributions From Trusts From Contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB484 is now Act 708 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed |