AR SB449 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB449 is now Act 548
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB449 is now Act 548
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Commerce - Arkansas Development Finance Authority Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Commerce - Arkansas Development Finance Authority Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB449 is now Act 548 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |