AR SB445 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Provisions Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendments 91 And 101, To Provide That Proceeds May Be Applied To Multilane Highway Improvements; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Provisions Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendments 91 And 101, To Provide That Proceeds May Be Applied To Multilane Highway Improvements; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Rep. Matt Brown [R] | Rep. Keith Brooks [R] | Rep. Brit McKenzie [R] |
Rep. David Ray [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Sen. Joshua Bryant [R] | Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] |
Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] |
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Matt McKee [R] |
Sen. John Payton [R] | Sen. Jim Petty [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Sen. Matt Stone [R] |
Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed |