AR SB377 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB377 is now Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB377 is now Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise Notification And Storage Policies And Procedures For Self-storage Facilities.
Title
To Revise Notification And Storage Policies And Procedures For Self-storage Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Williams [R] | Rep. Darrin Williams [D] | Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D] | Rep. James Ratliff [D] |
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB377 is now Act 364 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2013-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2013-02-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |