AR SB364 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB364 is now Act 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB364 is now Act 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 16 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Practice, Procedure, And The Courts.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 16 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Practice, Procedure, And The Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB364 is now Act 385 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2019-03-05 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |