AR SB360 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB360 is now Act 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB360 is now Act 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Higher Education And Northwest Technical Institute Development And Enhancement Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Higher Education And Northwest Technical Institute Development And Enhancement Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Notification that SB360 is now Act 845 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-04-20 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-04-19 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |