AR SB353 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That A Statement Of Legislative Intent Be Included In A Bill That Authorizes Promulgation Of State Agency Rules.
Title
To Require That A Statement Of Legislative Intent Be Included In A Bill That Authorizes Promulgation Of State Agency Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |