AR SB351 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate Peer-to-peer Car-sharing Programs; And To Create The Peer-to-peer Car-sharing Program Act.
Title
To Regulate Peer-to-peer Car-sharing Programs; And To Create The Peer-to-peer Car-sharing Program Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |