AR SB35 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Water Providers To Provide Water Service Within Their Water Service Territories Fairly And Equitably.
Title
To Require Water Providers To Provide Water Service Within Their Water Service Territories Fairly And Equitably.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 15 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Filed |