AR SB346 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB346 is now Act 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB346 is now Act 778
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Use Of Audio Media, Visual Media, And Audiovisual Media By Law Enforcement Agencies, Dispatch Centers, Public Safety Answering Points, Jails, And Detention Centers.
Title
Concerning The Use Of Audio Media, Visual Media, And Audiovisual Media By Law Enforcement Agencies, Dispatch Centers, Public Safety Answering Points, Jails, And Detention Centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Rapert [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Rep. Craig Christiansen [R] | Rep. Steve Hollowell [R] | Rep. Cameron Cooper [R] | Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] |
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. John Maddox [R] | Rep. Mark McElroy [R] |
Rep. Carol Dalby [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] | Rep. Jim Wooten [R] |
Rep. Deann Vaught [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Sen. David Wallace [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] | Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Notification that SB346 is now Act 778 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The vote by which SB346 Passed was expunged. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB346 passed. Motion passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |