AR SB340 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB340 is now Act 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate The Witnessing Of Certain Documents By A Notary Public; To Allow For Remote Witnessing Of Certain Documents By A Notary Public; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate The Witnessing Of Certain Documents By A Notary Public; To Allow For Remote Witnessing Of Certain Documents By A Notary Public; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateNotification that SB340 is now Act 1047
2021-04-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-26SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2021-04-26SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-04-26SenateReturned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-26HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-26HouseMotion to place on second reading for the purpose of amendment passed
2021-04-26HouseMotion to suspend rules to amend on House floor, Engross and for final passage passed
2021-04-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-04-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-04-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-14SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-13SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2021-03-09SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-03-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-09SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-02-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb340&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB340/SB340022220211334.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB340/SB340030920211052.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB340/SB340041320211329.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB340/SB340042620211459.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1047.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB340-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB340-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB340-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB340&rcs=2759&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB340&rcs=3122&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB340&rcs=3151&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback