AR SB340 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Notification that SB340 is now Act 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Wrongful Birth Civil Liability Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Wrongful Birth Civil Liability Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07SenateNotification that SB340 is now Act 385
2017-02-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-02-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-02-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-02-27SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-02-27HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-02-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback