AR SB312 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To End Enrollment In The Health Care Independence Program; To Restore Medicaid Waiver Programs Previously Ended Due To The Health Care Independence Program.
Title
To End Enrollment In The Health Care Independence Program; To Restore Medicaid Waiver Programs Previously Ended Due To The Health Care Independence Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |