AR SB301 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Require State Agencies To Return Fines Collected Under § 20-7-101 During The Public Health Emergency For A Failure To Comply With Rules, Orders, Or Directives Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require State Agencies To Return Fines Collected Under § 20-7-101 During The Public Health Emergency For A Failure To Comply With Rules, Orders, Or Directives Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - Override of Executive Veto Failed (Y: 39 N: 40 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Override the Governor's Veto of SB301. The override of the Governor's Veto passed. (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateSine Die adjournment
2021-03-29SenateReturned from the House having failed to override the Governor's Veto.
2021-03-29HouseReturn to the Senate failing the override of the executive veto
2021-03-23HouseOverride of Executive Veto Failed
2021-03-23HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House for consideration to override the Governor's Veto.
2021-03-23SenateThe override of the Governor's Veto passed.
2021-03-23SenateOverride the Governor's Veto of SB301. The override of the Governor's Veto passed.
2021-03-23SenateMotion passed.
2021-03-23SenateMotion to reconsider passage of SB301 notwithstanding the Veto of the Governor
2021-03-23SenateSB 301 vetoed by the Governor
2021-03-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-25SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2021-02-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-25SenateMotion for Immediate Consideration. Motion passed.
2021-02-24SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-22SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-22SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-22SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-22SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-02-10SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-10SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-10SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-10SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb301&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB301/SB301020820211308.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB301/SB301021020210938.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB301/SB301022220210938.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB301-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB301-S2.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/SB301-DFA1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB301&rcs=2075&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB301&rcs=2355&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB301&rcs=2452&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB301&rcs=2530&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback