AR SB292 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB292 is now Act 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB292 is now Act 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing The Public Safety Equipment Grant Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Establishing The Public Safety Equipment Grant Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Notification that SB292 is now Act 786 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-12 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-17 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed |