AR SB26 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB26 is now Act 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB26 is now Act 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Reduced Sales And Use Tax Rate For Utilities Used By Manufacturers; And To Apply A Reduced Sales And Use Tax Rate To Sales Of Coal For Use In Manufacturing.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Reduced Sales And Use Tax Rate For Utilities Used By Manufacturers; And To Apply A Reduced Sales And Use Tax Rate To Sales Of Coal For Use In Manufacturing.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sturch [R] | Rep. Stu Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Notification that SB26 is now Act 915 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Filed |