AR SB255 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Notification that SB255 is now Act 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Notification that SB255 is now Act 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Secretary Of State Reappropriation.
Title
An Act For The Secretary Of State Reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Notification that SB255 is now Act 395 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2015-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |