AR SB253 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Notification that SB253 is now Act 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Notification that SB253 is now Act 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Damaged Ballots; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Procedures.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Damaged Ballots; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Notification that SB253 is now Act 460 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |