AR SB250 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Notification that SB250 is now Act 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Educational Neglect; And To Amend The Law Concerning Reports Of Educational Neglect Made To The Child Abuse Hotline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Educational Neglect; And To Amend The Law Concerning Reports Of Educational Neglect Made To The Child Abuse Hotline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateNotification that SB250 is now Act 554
2019-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-25SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-20SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-14HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-18HouseRe-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback