AR SB236 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Public Employees' Political Freedom Act Of 1999 And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Public Employees' Political Freedom Act Of 1999 And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB236 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB236.pdf |