AR SB230 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB230 is now Act 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB230 is now Act 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Wineries To Collect Local Taxes On Direct Shipments Of Wine.
Title
An Act To Require Wineries To Collect Local Taxes On Direct Shipments Of Wine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB230 is now Act 236 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-13 | House | Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-02-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause failed of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |