AR SB221 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB221 is now Act 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB221 is now Act 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Counties To Purchase Excess, Surplus, Or Unused Bridge Steel Or Materials From The General Contractor Of Certain Public Works Projects.
Title
Authorizing Counties To Purchase Excess, Surplus, Or Unused Bridge Steel Or Materials From The General Contractor Of Certain Public Works Projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB221 is now Act 232 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |