AR SB218 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Notification that SB218 is now Act 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Deposits In The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan; To Repeal Certain Provisions Concerning The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Deposits In The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan; To Repeal Certain Provisions Concerning The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateNotification that SB218 is now Act 296
2019-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-02-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-26SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-25SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-21SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-02-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2019-02-12SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-02-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-12SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-12SenateAmendment #1 was withdrawn
2019-02-12SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-01-31SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback