AR SB192 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Notification that SB192 is now Act 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Notification that SB192 is now Act 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Coverage Of Biosimlar Medical Products Under Step Therapy Protocols; And To Amend Exceptions To Step Therapy Protocols.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Coverage Of Biosimlar Medical Products Under Step Therapy Protocols; And To Amend Exceptions To Step Therapy Protocols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Notification that SB192 is now Act 136 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed |