AR SB183 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Senate Notification that SB183 is now Act 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Senate Notification that SB183 is now Act 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase Title And Replacement Title Fees To Fund The Arkansas State Police Retirement System Of The Department Of Arkansas State Police And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Increase Title And Replacement Title Fees To Fund The Arkansas State Police Retirement System Of The Department Of Arkansas State Police And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Senate Notification that SB183 is now Act 718 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-23 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-23 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-08 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2011-02-08 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-08 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-01-28 | Senate Filed |