AR SB152 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Notification that SB152 is now Act 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Restoring Arkansas Families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Restoring Arkansas Families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateNotification that SB152 is now Act 189
2019-02-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-05SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback