AR SB147 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Alimony Support.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Alimony Support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Notice of Reconsideration given. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |