AR SB138 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that SB138 is now Act 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that SB138 is now Act 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Procedure For The Revocation Of A Charter Of A Municipal Corporation As A Result Of The Municipal Corporation's Noncompliance With The Law.
Title
To Create A Procedure For The Revocation Of A Charter Of A Municipal Corporation As A Result Of The Municipal Corporation's Noncompliance With The Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 62 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB138 is now Act 712 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |