AR SB131 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Notification that SB131 is now Act 145
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Notification that SB131 is now Act 145
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Protect The Privacy Of Owners Of, And Applicants For, Concealed Handgun Carry Licenses; To Exempt The Name And Corresponding Zip Code Of The Applicant, Licensee, Or Past Licensee From Disclosure; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Protect The Privacy Of Owners Of, And Applicants For, Concealed Handgun Carry Licenses; To Exempt The Name And Corresponding Zip Code Of The Applicant, Licensee, Or Past Licensee From Disclosure; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | Notification that SB131 is now Act 145 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-19 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed |