AR SB130 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB130 is now Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB130 is now Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System To Increase Or Decrease The Stipend Benefit For Members As Actuarially Appropriate And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System To Increase Or Decrease The Stipend Benefit For Members As Actuarially Appropriate And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notification that SB130 is now Act 603 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed |