AR SB128 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Notification that SB128 is now Act 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Notification that SB128 is now Act 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Powers And Duties Of The Division Of Emergency Management; And To Delegate The Administration Of The Arkansas Continuity Of Operations Program.
Title
To Amend The Powers And Duties Of The Division Of Emergency Management; And To Delegate The Administration Of The Arkansas Continuity Of Operations Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane English [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Notification that SB128 is now Act 70 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-01-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |