AR SB125 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB125 is now Act 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB125 is now Act 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Free Speech Rights At State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education.
Title
Concerning Free Speech Rights At State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB125 is now Act 614 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed |