AR SB122 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Auditor Of State - Deputy Prosecuting Attorneys Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Auditor Of State - Deputy Prosecuting Attorneys Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |