AR SB120 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Arkansas Tax Law Concerning Income Tax, Sales And Use Taxes, And The Soft Drink Tax; And To Supplement The Arkansas Medicaid Program Trust Fund To Offset Decreased Deposits From Tax Revenues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Arkansas Tax Law Concerning Income Tax, Sales And Use Taxes, And The Soft Drink Tax; And To Supplement The Arkansas Medicaid Program Trust Fund To Offset Decreased Deposits From Tax Revenues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-05-01SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2017-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2017-01-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-01-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-01-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-01-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-26SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-01-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-26SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-26SenateAmendment 1 Withdrawn
2017-01-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-01-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback