AR SB117 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Requirement That An Additional Registration Fee Be Paid For Electric And Hybrid Vehicles; And To Repeal The Additional Fee For The Registration Of Hybrid Vehicles.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Requirement That An Additional Registration Fee Be Paid For Electric And Hybrid Vehicles; And To Repeal The Additional Fee For The Registration Of Hybrid Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |