AR SB111 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Notification that SB111 is now Act 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Notification that SB111 is now Act 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Certain Insurers To Offer Family Leave Insurance.
Title
To Allow Certain Insurers To Offer Family Leave Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Notification that SB111 is now Act 84 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-02-13 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed |