AR SB1100 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1100 is now Act 1429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Concerning The Arkansas School Recognition And Reward Program, School Improvement, And Academic Distress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Concerning The Arkansas School Recognition And Reward Program, School Improvement, And Academic Distress.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1100 is now Act 1429
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-18SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-18HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-08SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2013-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback